AZ SB1271 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical graduate transitional training permits
Title
Medical graduate transitional training permits
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Cesar Chavez [D] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Alma Hernandez [D] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 354 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applications
Associate Physicians
Collaborative Practice
Collaborative Practice Arrangements
Controlled Substances
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Health Services
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Licensure
Medical Board
Medical Graduate
Medical School Graduate
Osteopathic Graduate
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulation
Report
Requirements
Rulemaking Exemption
Rules
Training Permits
Transitional Training Permits
Associate Physicians
Collaborative Practice
Collaborative Practice Arrangements
Controlled Substances
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Health Services
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Licensure
Medical Board
Medical Graduate
Medical School Graduate
Osteopathic Graduate
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulation
Report
Requirements
Rulemaking Exemption
Rules
Training Permits
Transitional Training Permits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1432.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1459 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1829.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1862 | New Code | See Bill Text |