AZ SB1271 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purchaser dwelling actions; notice; complaints

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchaser dwelling actions; notice; complaints

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateChapter 60
2019-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-04SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121362Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121364New CodeSee Bill Text
321159.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71886
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1271p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1271s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1271h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0060.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1271farnsworth e. (12).docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1271jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1271floorfann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1271allen j.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1271judiciary.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188059&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188080&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188738&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188739&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188826&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71886&billStatusActionId=188829&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback