AZ SB1271 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Construction liability; apportionment; study

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction liability; apportionment; study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-20HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321159Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70382
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1271p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1271s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1271h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0336.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1271smith.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12710435.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1271comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1271worsley.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12710830.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12710550.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1271jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1271fann0915.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1271commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70382&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70382&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70382&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=182116&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=182209&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70382&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70382&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=183311&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=183332&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=183640&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70382&billStatusActionId=183646&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback