AZ SB1268 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor organizations; fiduciary guidelines; disclosure
Title
Labor organizations; fiduciary guidelines; disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 347 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accounting Methods
Applicability
Benefit Category
Benefit Choice
Contracts
Definition
Disclosure
Dues
Fiduciary Guidelines
Fringe Benefit Contributions
Labor - Title 23
Labor Organizations
Labor Relations
Severability
Applicability
Benefit Category
Benefit Choice
Contracts
Definition
Disclosure
Dues
Fiduciary Guidelines
Fringe Benefit Contributions
Labor - Title 23
Labor Organizations
Labor Relations
Severability