AZ SB1268 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (11-49-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (11-49-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Class six property; elderly homeowners
Title
Class six property; elderly homeowners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (11-49-0-0) |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |