AZ SB1261 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Texting while driving; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting while driving; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-06SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
283154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28913New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback