AZ SB1260 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Small businesses; income tax; rate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small businesses; income tax; rate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18SenateChapter 67
2023-04-18SenateGovernor Signed
2023-04-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-04-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-04-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-21-3-0)
2023-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-15HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2023-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-06SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2023-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78888
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1260p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1260s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0067.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502906
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506515
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506768
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506775
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506832
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508761
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509625
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78888&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78888&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78888&billStatusActionId=215794&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78888&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78888&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78888&billStatusActionId=218469&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback