AZ SB1257 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Misconduct involving weapons; public places
Title
Misconduct involving weapons; public places
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2016-04-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |