AZ SB1256 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School districts: procurement practices; auditors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts: procurement practices; auditors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateChapter 85
2019-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-2-0)
2019-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-2-1-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15213.04Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71864
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1256p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1256s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0085.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.12561132.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1256ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1256lieberman.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71864&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71864&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71864&billStatusActionId=187392&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71864&billStatusActionId=187449&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71864&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71864&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71864&billStatusActionId=188857&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback