AZ SB1255 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle emissions inspection program; continuation
Title
Vehicle emissions inspection program; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Chapter 34 | |
2016-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-16 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |