AZ SB1254 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; admissions; desegregation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; admissions; desegregation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateChapter 146
2017-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0)
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-13HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-01-26SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-25SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15816.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69035
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1254p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1254s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0146.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69035&billStatusActionId=174697&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69035&billStatusActionId=176722&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69035&billStatusActionId=176853&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback