AZ SB1253 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Game and fish; licenses; fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; licenses; fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateChapter 103
2018-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-1-0)
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-29SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17333.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
17336Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
17338Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5328Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70360
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1253p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1253s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0103.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12530421.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1253nrew.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70360&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70360&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70360&billStatusActionId=180550&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70360&billStatusActionId=180641&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70360&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70360&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70360&billStatusActionId=182631&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback