AZ SB1250 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Overdose; disease prevention; programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overdose; disease prevention; programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24SenateChapter 382
2021-05-24SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-05-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0)
2021-03-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-03-15HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-08HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2021-01-25SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75001
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1250p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1250s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0382.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481521
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486967
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487254
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487403
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489632
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490162
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75001&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75001&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75001&billStatusActionId=200201&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75001&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75001&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75001&billStatusActionId=204095&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback