AZ SB1245 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
VLT; cities and towns; counties
Title
VLT; cities and towns; counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns
Counties
Sources
State Highway Fund
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle License Tax (vlt)
Vehicle License Tax Distribution
Vlt (see: Vehicle License Tax)
Counties
Sources
State Highway Fund
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle License Tax (vlt)
Vehicle License Tax Distribution
Vlt (see: Vehicle License Tax)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |