AZ SB1245 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco; vapor; alternative nicotine; regulation
Title
Tobacco; vapor; alternative nicotine; regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Title 4
Alternative Nicotine
Alternative Nicotine Product
Alternative Tobacco Product
Alternative Vapor Product
Civil Penalties
Collaboration
Counties
Criminal Code - Title 13
Delegation Of Authority
Effective Date
Exceptions
Fees
Fraudulent Identification
Licenses
Licensing Fund
Penalties
Preemption
Prohibitions
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
Reporting Requirements
Requirements
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rulemaking
Severability
Single State Standard
Three-fourths Vote
Tobacco
Tobacco Retail Sales
Training
Vapor
Vending Machine Sales
Violations
Alternative Nicotine
Alternative Nicotine Product
Alternative Tobacco Product
Alternative Vapor Product
Civil Penalties
Collaboration
Counties
Criminal Code - Title 13
Delegation Of Authority
Effective Date
Exceptions
Fees
Fraudulent Identification
Licenses
Licensing Fund
Penalties
Preemption
Prohibitions
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
Reporting Requirements
Requirements
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rulemaking
Severability
Single State Standard
Three-fourths Vote
Tobacco
Tobacco Retail Sales
Training
Vapor
Vending Machine Sales
Violations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 601.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 244 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |