AZ SB1245 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; SNAP; benefit match; produce
Title
Appropriation; SNAP; benefit match; produce
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Rep. Heather Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 334 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0) |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Arizona-grown Produce
Benefit Match
Department Of Economic Security
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Arizona-grown Produce
Benefit Match
Department Of Economic Security
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program