AZ SB1242 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing care; assisted living; regulation
Title
Nursing care; assisted living; regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 15 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-5-3-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-28 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Assisted Living Facility Managers
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators And Assisted Living Facility Managers (h)
Complaint Referral
Definitions
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Duties
Exemption
Fees
Fingerprinting
Nursing Care
Nursing Care Administrators
Powers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Regulation
Report
Rules
Assisted Living Facility Managers
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators And Assisted Living Facility Managers (h)
Complaint Referral
Definitions
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Duties
Exemption
Fees
Fingerprinting
Nursing Care
Nursing Care Administrators
Powers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifications
Regulation
Report
Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 446.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 446.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |