AZ SB1239 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Tribal nations; veterans' services; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal nations; veterans' services; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-12SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback