AZ SB1238 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Auto glass repair
Title
Auto glass repair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Senate final reading , voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (33-26-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-09 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |