AZ SB1236 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
College savings program; name change
Title
College savings program; name change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Chapter 188 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-8-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report (h)
Arizona's Education Savings Plan
Az529
College Savings Program
Definitions (h)
Education - Title 15
Family College Savings Program
Fund
Heading Change
Name Change
Plan
Public Finances - Title 35
Requirements (h)
State Government - Title 41
Treasurer (h)
Trust Fund
Arizona's Education Savings Plan
Az529
College Savings Program
Definitions (h)
Education - Title 15
Family College Savings Program
Fund
Heading Change
Name Change
Plan
Public Finances - Title 35
Requirements (h)
State Government - Title 41
Treasurer (h)
Trust Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1873 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1874 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1878 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1879 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 179 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |