AZ SB1235 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Native American day; state holiday

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native American day; state holiday

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 148
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-19HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-15HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-14HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70333
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1235p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1235s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0148.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1235borrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1235gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1235borrelli0321.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70333&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70333&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70333&billStatusActionId=182479&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70333&billStatusActionId=182490&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70333&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70333&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70333&billStatusActionId=182835&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback