AZ SB1235 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit; water conservation systems
Title
Tax credit; water conservation systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-3-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |