AZ SB1235 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement officers; disciplinary procedures
Title
Law enforcement officers; disciplinary procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Paula Aboud [D] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |