AZ SB1223 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Written vehicle accident reports; threshold

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Written vehicle accident reports; threshold

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateChapter 168
2019-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-14HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28667Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71802
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1223p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1223s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0168.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.12230819.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1223tps.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71802&billStatusActionId=187196&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71802&billStatusActionId=187231&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71802&billStatusActionId=189155&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback