AZ SB1220 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reviser's technical corrections; 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reviser's technical corrections; 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DPA/C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateChapter 279
2019-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate concurs
2019-05-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-27SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-20HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: DPA/C&P, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12114Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
151655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15341Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15392Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
282356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331228Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411758Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71799
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1220p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1220s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1220h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0279.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1220rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71799&billStatusActionId=187423&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71799&billStatusActionId=189836&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71799&billStatusActionId=189852&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71799&billStatusActionId=189944&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71799&billStatusActionId=189954&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback