AZ SB1220 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tribal colleges; unclaimed lottery money
Title
Tribal colleges; unclaimed lottery money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |