AZ SB1220 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2492
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Independent redistricting commission; supplemental appropriation
Title
Independent redistricting commission; supplemental appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] |
Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Sen. Anna Tovar [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Chapter 3 | |
2014-02-06 | Governor Signed | |
2014-02-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-01-30 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-2-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2492 (Replaces) 2014-01-30 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass