AZ SB1216 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Orders of protection; duration
Title
Orders of protection; duration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |