AZ SB1212 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
National guard; peace officers; appointment
Title
National guard; peace officers; appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 147 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-0-8-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |