AZ SB1212 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement officers; just cause
Title
Law enforcement officers; just cause
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-18 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-4-0) | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2012-03-19 | House Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 4:40 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-08 | House ERA Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-07 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-09 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-09 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |