AZ SB1211 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative rules; expiration; legislative extension
Title
Administrative rules; expiration; legislative extension
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Procedures Act
Administrative Rules
Expiration
Legislative Extension
State Government - Title 41
Administrative Procedures Act
Administrative Rules
Expiration
Legislative Extension
State Government - Title 41