AZ SB1211 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mexican wolf; taking; reporting
Title
Mexican wolf; taking; reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] |
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |