AZ SB1202 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forestry and fire management; conformity
Title
Forestry and fire management; conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chapter 258 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (33-22-5-0) |
2017-04-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-2-1) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | House Conference adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Minority report |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2017-03-30 | House | House Minority report |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference members: ALLEN S has been replaced by FARNSWORTH D - 3/29/17 DALESSANDRO has been replaced by OTONDO - 3/30/17 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Conference members: BOWERS, COOK, ENGEL |
2017-03-29 | House | House Conference appointed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference members: GRIFFIN, FARNSWORTH D, OTONDO |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Cities And Towns
Conformity
Counties
Department Of Forestry And Fire Management
Education
Fire Management
Forest Management
Insurance
Public Buildings And Improvements
Public Health And Safety
Public Lands
Secretary Of State
Special Taxing Districts
State Government
Taxation
The Environment
Alcoholic Beverages
Cities And Towns
Conformity
Counties
Department Of Forestry And Fire Management
Education
Fire Management
Forest Management
Insurance
Public Buildings And Improvements
Public Health And Safety
Public Lands
Secretary Of State
Special Taxing Districts
State Government
Taxation
The Environment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1636 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 883 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1384 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1388 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |