AZ SB1201 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Veterinarian board; complaints; records; specialists
Title
Veterinarian board; complaints; records; specialists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appointment
Board
Compensation
Complaints
Consultant Lists
Definition
Domestic Animal
Members
Officers
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
Records
Retention Of Members
Specialists
Terms
Veterinarian Board
Veterinarians
Board
Compensation
Complaints
Consultant Lists
Definition
Domestic Animal
Members
Officers
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
Records
Retention Of Members
Specialists
Terms
Veterinarian Board
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |