AZ SB1200 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 260
2018-04-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-19SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-04-19SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-12SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0)
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
281385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282293Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283051Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
283052Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
283153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283158Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283172Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
283477Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
28363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284543Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
285615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285639Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28755Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287618New CodeSee Bill Text
287711New CodeSee Bill Text
288242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28961Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41835.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41835.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70284
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1200p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1200s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1200h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0260.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12000313.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1200transit.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1200campbell.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1200transportation and infrastructure.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70284&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70284&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=180076&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=180087&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70284&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70284&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=183248&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=183256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=183341&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70284&billStatusActionId=183343&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback