AZ SB1199 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history investigation; name change
Title
Criminal history investigation; name change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-2-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |