AZ SB1194 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State veterinarian; certified rabies vaccinator

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State veterinarian; certified rabies vaccinator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateChapter 132
2023-05-11SenateGovernor Signed
2023-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-1-4-0)
2023-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-20HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2023-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2023-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2023-01-25SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
111002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
111010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322240.02New CodeSee Bill Text
322271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78803
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1194p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1194s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0132.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.1194NREW.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.11941021.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503471
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503657
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505094
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506868
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507370
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508966
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509201
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78803&billStatusActionId=215865&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78803&billStatusActionId=215890&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78803&billStatusActionId=218732&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback