AZ SB1194 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Indian nations; tribes; legislative day
Title
Indian nations; tribes; legislative day
Sponsors
Sen. Theresa Hatathlie [D] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Sen. Raquel Teran [D] | Rep. Richard Andrade [D] |
Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Rep. Jennifer Jermaine [D] | Rep. Myron Tsosie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Indian Nations
Indian Nations And Tribes Legislative Day
Indigenous Peoples Caucus
Legislative Day
State Government - Title 41
Tribes
Indian Nations And Tribes Legislative Day
Indigenous Peoples Caucus
Legislative Day
State Government - Title 41
Tribes