AZ SB1194 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2495
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Loan repayment; medically underserved areas
Title
Loan repayment; medically underserved areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rural Affairs and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rural Affairs and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Chapter 3 | |
2015-02-24 | Governor Signed | |
2015-02-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate RAE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RAE Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RAE Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2495 (Replaces) 2015-02-18 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended