AZ SB1191 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Students; community college grants
Title
Students; community college grants
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] |
Sen. Tony Navarrete [D] | Rep. Jennifer Jermaine [D] | Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Works
Arizona Works Community College Grant Fund
Community College District Governing Boards
Community College Grants
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Retroactivity
Student
Arizona Works
Arizona Works Community College Grant Fund
Community College District Governing Boards
Community College Grants
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Retroactivity
Student