AZ SB1191 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2191
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Chapter 5 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Chapter 5 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Graduation; passing test score; moratorium
Title
Graduation; passing test score; moratorium
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Chapter 5 E | |
2015-02-20 | Governor Signed | |
2015-02-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Replaces) 2015-02-19 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended