AZ SB1188 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Permanent early voting list

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permanent early voting list

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-26HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-07SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16544Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71755
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1188p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1188s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1188ugenti-rita0843.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71755&billStatusActionId=187743&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71755&billStatusActionId=188057&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71755&billStatusActionId=188079&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback