AZ SB1186 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alarm industry; fingerprint requirements
Title
Alarm industry; fingerprint requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 219 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-13 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Alarm Industry
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Fingerprint Requirements
Professions And Occupations
State Board Of Technical Registration
State Government
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Fingerprint Requirements
Professions And Occupations
State Board Of Technical Registration
State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 122.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 122.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 122.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |