AZ SB1185 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; named claimants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; named claimants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 215
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-08HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2018-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70248
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1185p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1185s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0215.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70248&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70248&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70248&billStatusActionId=180523&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70248&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70248&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70248&billStatusActionId=183046&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback