AZ SB1184 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; economics; personal financial management
Title
Schools; economics; personal financial management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 84 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-1-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Economics
Education - Title 15
Financial Literacy
Personal Financial Management
Relating School Curricula
Schools
Education - Title 15
Financial Literacy
Personal Financial Management
Relating School Curricula
Schools