AZ SB1180 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bingo establishments; ADA compliance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bingo establishments; ADA compliance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateChapter 240
2017-05-01SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-25SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-3-2-0)
2017-04-25SenateSenate concurs
2017-04-25SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-3-5-0)
2017-04-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-22HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2017-01-25SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5406Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68951
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1180p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1180s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1180h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0240.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1180lovas.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68951&billStatusActionId=175607&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68951&billStatusActionId=177043&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68951&billStatusActionId=177185&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68951&billStatusActionId=177221&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68951&billStatusActionId=177227&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback