AZ SB1179 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In god we trust plates
Title
In god we trust plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Senate final reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (51-5-4-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-4-0-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |