AZ SB1177 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Forest products; processing; tax credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forest products; processing; tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-18HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2021-01-21SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431076.01New CodeSee Bill Text
431162New CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74783
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1177p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1177s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.11771107.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1177approp.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480693
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482023
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482166
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482760
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486520
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486800
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74783&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74783&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74783&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74783&billStatusActionId=200540&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74783&billStatusActionId=201082&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74783&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback