AZ SB1176 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; electronic funds transfers
Title
Fire districts; electronic funds transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Chapter 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 805.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 853 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |