AZ SB1174 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; STEM internships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; STEM internships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseHouse ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-04HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0)
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-01-20SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74780
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1174p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1174s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1174floorshope.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482244
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485900
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486541
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74780&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74780&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74780&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74780&billStatusActionId=201831&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74780&billStatusActionId=202002&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74780&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback